U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00642
  • Case Name: Hafen v. Sargent et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.