U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00379-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abrego
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.