U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order for Exam]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.