U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Navarro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.