U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-30085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Accepting Plea and Scheduling Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Consent]
  • January 19, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2021: [Request]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 16, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.