U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-10034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Consent]
  • April 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 14, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 14, 2022: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 18, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [Consent]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • December 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 15, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extend]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Request]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.