U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-40289
  • Case Name: Yolanda Tanala Soliman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of TFR (used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (without notice)]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • December 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (text order)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Corrective Entry]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.