U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 18, 2023: [Forfeiture]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 17, 2023: [Forfeiture]
  • January 17, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 29, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 29, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2022: [Consent]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extend]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 01, 2022: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Consent]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extend]
  • July 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Suppress]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2022: [Consent]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 09, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Consent]
  • June 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Request]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • November 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.