U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abdulkadir
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 06, 2022: [Forfeiture]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extend]
  • May 09, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2021: [Request]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • September 13, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.