U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [Expedite ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2023: [Declaration of Publication]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 05, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 16, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • November 16, 2022: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Verdict]
  • November 16, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • November 16, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 16, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 16, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 15, 2022: [Jury List]
  • November 15, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 08, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 16, 2022: [Furlough]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 05, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Reconsideration]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 28, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2022: [Consent]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 05, 2022: [Request]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 06, 2022: [Furlough]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 03, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 16, 2021: [Request]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • September 16, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.