U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 29, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Request]
  • September 22, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.