U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Francois
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extend]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
  • October 17, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 01, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • July 18, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Request]
  • January 05, 2022: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Bail Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.