U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rios
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 20, 2022: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • September 20, 2022: [Consent]
  • September 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 13, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2021: [Request]
  • November 08, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Bail Report]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 17, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.