U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-40279
  • Case Name: Kenneth Jerald Oleson and Bonita Lee Oleson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2021
  • December 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - hrng held (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (text entry only)]
  • December 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacate Order (no notice required)]
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - no hrng (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • September 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • September 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • September 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.