U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Younger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Declaration of Publication]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2021: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 12, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 21, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2021: [Request]
  • August 31, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.