U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grueschow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 19, 2022: [Leave to]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Consent]
  • January 28, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2021: [Consent]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2021: [Request]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • August 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.