U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smoke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 15, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 05, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extend]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 02, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2021: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 12, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Request]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 27, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.