U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garnier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 08, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 08, 2022: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 17, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • July 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extend]
  • July 01, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extend]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 18, 2022: [Consent]
  • February 18, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 20, 2021: [Request]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.