U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-30083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brushbreaker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 13, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 21, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extend]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 17, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 03, 2021: [Furlough]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 21, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2021: [Request]
  • August 25, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Request]
  • August 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.