U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • November 02, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2021: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Consent]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.