U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dahl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 03, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Consent]
  • August 22, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 08, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [For Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 20, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.