U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment - Amended]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Consent]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 16, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 04, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 12, 2022: [Consent]
  • August 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Furlough]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 23, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.