U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanapel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extend]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • October 06, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response to Jury Question]
  • October 06, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • October 06, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 06, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 06, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 06, 2022: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 05, 2022: [Jury List]
  • October 05, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice]
  • September 26, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 21, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 09, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • September 09, 2022: [For Order]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [Response]
  • January 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 29, 2021: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.