U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paulson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Text Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Response]
  • October 08, 2024: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2023: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 30, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2021: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.