U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Joinder]
  • August 11, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Request]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • August 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.