U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kemp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2022: [Consent]
  • December 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Text Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.