U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fontenot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2022: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Verdict]
  • November 03, 2022: [Jury Question]
  • November 03, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 03, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • November 02, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Jury List]
  • November 01, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 20, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 19, 2022: [Jury List]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response]
  • October 12, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 11, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2022: [Furlough]
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 28, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 19, 2022: [Furlough]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.