U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-50140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lehmann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Passport - Return of]
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 16, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Consent]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 21, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 02, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2021: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.