U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-40048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vortherms
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 31, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 12, 2022: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 23, 2021: [Consent]
  • November 23, 2021: [Leave to]
  • November 10, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extend]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Leave to]
  • October 27, 2021: [Suppress]
  • October 26, 2021: [Suppress]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2021: [Consent]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2021: [Suppress]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • May 05, 2021: [Request]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.