U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bohn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 23, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 12, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 07, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Request]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 15, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 15, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 08, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 08, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 07, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.