U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03016
  • Case Name: Zeisler et al v. Hickey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 05, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal (attorney use)]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 17, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Discovery Report]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice]
  • February 15, 2021: [Discovery Report]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 01, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.