U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-05055
  • Case Name: Esperance v. Perdue
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • August 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extend]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter Sent]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 06, 2021: [Extend]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Text Order]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2021: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Discovery Report]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • November 30, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 23, 2020: [Certificate of Service (attorney use)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 03, 2020: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 03, 2020: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.