U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-05035
  • Case Name: Miss Rodeo America, Inc. v. Miss Rodeo South Dakota Pagent, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal (attorney use)]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Discovery Report]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Letter Sent]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • June 18, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 02, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 29, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice]
  • May 28, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 28, 2020: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.