U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-05033
  • Case Name: Elnora v. Burger King LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 12, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 24, 2021: [Supplement]
  • November 22, 2021: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • November 22, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 19, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 18, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 13, 2021: [Letter Received]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Letter Received]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Letter Sent]
  • May 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 04, 2021: [Letter Sent]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Letter Sent]
  • April 20, 2021: [Letter Received]
  • April 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2021: [Letter Sent]
  • April 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Letter Sent]
  • February 10, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Letter Sent]
  • January 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • January 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 05, 2021: [Letter Sent]
  • January 05, 2021: [Return of Service Executed]
  • January 05, 2021: [Return of Service Unexecuted]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2020: [Supplement]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [Response]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 17, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 15, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 13, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 13, 2020: [Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Letter Sent]
  • July 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2020: [Supplement]
  • July 28, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2020: [Letter Sent]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Letter Sent]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [New Case Letter - Nonprisoner Case]
  • May 13, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2020: [Request for Electronic Notice (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 13, 2020: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.