U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mathews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 10, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 08, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Supplement]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • September 17, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 17, 2021: [Admission]
  • September 13, 2021: [Response]
  • September 13, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 03, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 22, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Expedite ]
  • June 04, 2020: [Expedite ]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 01, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 20, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 13, 2020: [Response]
  • February 13, 2020: [Request]
  • February 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 07, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.