U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-50009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Apodaca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 12, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Furlough]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 17, 2020: [Furlough]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • February 06, 2020: [Request]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 05, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.