U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-40003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peters et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 14, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • January 12, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 08, 2021: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • January 07, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Consent]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2020: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Passport - Receipt of]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2020: [Request]
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Request]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.