U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-05026
  • Case Name: Dakota Rural Action et al v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2019: [Dismiss]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Leave to]
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 21, 2019: [Response]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Joinder]
  • April 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 17, 2019: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 11, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 04, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • March 29, 2019: [Request for Issuance of Summons(es)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.