U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-05024
  • Case Name: Jockisch v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
May, 2019
  • May 25, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 25, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2019: [Summons Issued as to USA]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Request for Issuance of Summons(es)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Request for Issuance of Summons(es) (SHELL CASE)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 26, 2019: [Complaint - Social Security Appeal (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.