U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-04002
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Stene
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 07, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 07, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • April 23, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • March 13, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.