U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50034
  • Case Name: John Lee Chambers and Peggy Lynn Chambers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver of notice) (fee required)]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.