U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40062
  • Case Name: Monica Anne Wall and Jeffery David Wall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.