U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40058
  • Case Name: Nicholas Jon Peterson and Ashley Sue Zinda-Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (without notice)]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (text entry only)]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • November 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Intention]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule of Required Disclosures After Conversion]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule of Required Disclosures After Conversion]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • October 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Codebtor Stay]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Codebtor Stay (Ch 12 & 13 only)]
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.