U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50031
  • Case Name: Northwest Farm & Supply Co.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Conditional Use of Cash Collateral]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Authority to File - Ch 11]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.