U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-05002
  • Case Name: Bussiere v. Bussiere
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Nonstandard Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Brief]
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.