U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50028
  • Case Name: Ronald Ray Stanton and Bobbi Jean Stanton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
August, 2022
  • August 14, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • August 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.