U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 11-50153
  • Case Name: Glenn Richard Warren and Joyce Ilene Warren
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Returned Funds/New Estate Funds]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (text order)]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Filing Proof of Claim]
  • February 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (Text Order)]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (no fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.