U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40044
  • Case Name: Kylie Michelle Murray
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
February, 2019
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.