U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-04001
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Arcudi et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 23, 2020: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
May, 2019
  • May 18, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • March 22, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Complaint]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.