U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50025
  • Case Name: Maria Julianita Vigil
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • August 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2020
  • April 04, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • April 02, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
May, 2019
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.